KY HCR125 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge the Kentucky Department of Agriculture, Kentucky State University, the University of Kentucky College of Agriculture, and the Governor's Office of Agricultural Policy to assess the economic condition and needs of black farmers in Kentucky.
Title
Urge the Kentucky Department of Agriculture, Kentucky State University, the University of Kentucky College of Agriculture, and the Governor's Office of Agricultural Policy to assess the economic condition and needs of black farmers in Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, adopted 96-0 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-14 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2011-02-11 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC125.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC125/bill.doc |