KY HB89 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.545 to provide that if a member is working in a regular full-time hazardous duty position that participates in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System or the County Employees Retirement System and is simultaneously employed in a nonhazardous position that is not considered regular full-time, the member shall participate solely as a hazardous duty member and shall not participate under the nonhazardous position unless he or she makes an election within 30 days of taking employment in the nonhazardous position; amend KRS 61.680 to conform; specify that provisions shall only apply to prospective nonhazardous employment occurring on or after the effective date of the Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to dually employed retirement system members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 26 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 23, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-11-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |