KY HB87 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304, relating to health benefit plans, to require coverage for infertility treatment; prohibit insurers from denying coverage for services which would otherwise be covered services solely because the services may result in infertility; require the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to promulgate administrative regulations to establish guidelines and standards for the coverage required; create a new section of KRS 311.530 to 311.620 to require the State Board of Medical Licensure to promulgate administrative regulations to establish guidelines and standards for the provision of infertility services; amend KRS 18A.225 to require infertility coverage for the state employee health plan; amend KRS 205.560 to include infertility treatment in the scope of care for the Kentucky Medical Assistance Program; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to infertility treatment coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Men
Public Medical Assistance
State Employees
Women
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Men
Public Medical Assistance
State Employees
Women
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb87.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb87/orig_bill.pdf |