KY HB79 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.286, relating to the ability of local governments to allow operation of golf cart on roads under their control, to expand the allowable distance from a golf course from five miles to seven miles.
Title
AN ACT relating to the operation of golf carts on public roads.
Sponsors
Rep. John Arnold [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53) | |
2010-03-22 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-22 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-19 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-19 | received in House | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | to Transportation (S) | |
2010-02-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-25 | 3rd reading, passed 94-5 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-24 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Transportation (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Transportation |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB79.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB79/bill.doc |