KY HB61 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311B.020 to redefine"limited X-ray machine operator" and "medical imaging technologist" to provide limited exemptions from the place-of-employment restrictions on limited X-ray machine operators.
Title
AN ACT relating to limited X-ray machine operators.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 33 (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-17 |
2022-01-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 19, 2022 |
2022-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-12 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-09-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |