KY HB556 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 48.310, relating to branch budget bills, to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Scott Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 465 (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 1918 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 455 (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1838 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 199 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 1918 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 455 (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1838 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 199 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 194) |
2021-04-07 | House | 2 line items vetoed |
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill passed 79-12 |
2021-03-30 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2021-03-30 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee report |
2021-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | received in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Bill passed 30-4 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Senate Committee Substitute reconsidered |
2021-03-30 | House | returned to the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | received in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-4 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 30, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-01 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-01 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2021-02-24 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-23 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | introduced in House |