KY HB535 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - WITHDRAWN
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - WITHDRAWN
Summary
Amend KRS 75.040 to permit fire protection districts located within the territorial boundaries of a consolidated local government to operate an emergency ambulance service; amend KRS 216B.020 to exclude emergency ambulance services operated by fire protection districts located within the territorial boundaries of a consolidated local government from the certificate of need process.
Title
AN ACT relating to the emergency ambulance services provided by fire protection districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-15 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-15 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-15 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-03 | reassigned to Local Government (H) | |
2010-02-26 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB535.htm |