KY HB530 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.174, regarding personalized license plates, to have personalized plates expire on the last day of the birth month of the applicant, rather than on December 31st of each year; set forth schedule for transition to a new expiration date for current license holders; set the replacement schedule for personalized license to match that for regular plates; amend KRS 186.164 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to personalized license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 681 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 680 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 268 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 680 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 268 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148) |
2018-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | House | received in House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-14 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 12, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-03-07 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-28 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | introduced in House |