KY HB53 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - recommitted to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
Pending: House Small Business & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - recommitted to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
Pending: House Small Business & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 336 to declare that professional employer organizations provide a valuable service to commerce and should be properly recognized and regulated; define "client," "co-employer," "co-employment relationship," "covered employee," "professional employer organization group," "person," "professional employer agreement," "professional employer organization," "professional employer services," "registrant," and "temporary help service"; indicate that covered employees shall be deemed employees of the client for purposes of determining tax credits or economic incentives; require a person providing professional employer services to be registered and to set forth the registration requirements; require professional employer organizations to pay a registration fee; require a professional employer organization to either maintain positive working capital or provide a bond, letter of credit, or security; set forth the rights and responsibilities of parties to a co-employment agreement; set forth the health insurance obligations of professional employer organizations; set forth the workers' compensation requirements of professional employer organizations and the client; set forth the unemployment insurance obligations of the professional employer organization and the client; prohibit a person from knowingly providing professional employer services without becoming registered and set forth actions that may be taken by the Labor Cabinet against any person in violation; amend KRS 336.990 to provide a civil penalty; amend the definition of "premium" in KRS 342.0011 to include co-employment relationships with a professional employer organization; amend KRS 342.990 to delete references to KRS 342.615; repeal KRS 342.615; state that the provisions of this Act are severable.
Title
AN ACT relating to the recognition and registration of professional employer organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | recommitted to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-10 | House | reassigned to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-09-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Economic Development
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Unemployment Compensation
Workers' Compensation
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Unemployment Compensation
Workers' Compensation
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb53.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb53/orig_bill.pdf |