KY HB525 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - recommitted to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - recommitted to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 174.040 to require the secretary of the Transportation Cabinet to development a procedure to ensure fairness and equality of pay in classified service positions in every county of the Commonwealth and to work with the secretary of the Personnel Cabinet; amend KRS 18A.110 to require the secretary of the Personnel Cabinet to draft an administrative regulation providing for this procedure.
Title
AN ACT relating to wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | recommitted to State Government (H) |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-02 | House | reassigned to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | introduced in House |