KY HB520 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 209 to define the terms "adult" and "cabinet"; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish a registry of persons found to have abused, neglected, or exploited an adult; require an appeal process for persons against whom allegations have been substantiated by the cabinet, and prohibit a licensed or certified facility or program from employing a person on the registry; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to prohibit health care facilities and services licensed under KRS Chapter 216B from employing, contracting with, or accepting volunteer services from a person whose name appears on the registry; amend KRS 205.5606 to prohibit persons who provide services or supports from employing, contracting with, or accepting volunteer services from a person whose name appears on the registry; amend KRS 210.795 to prohibit an individual whose name appears on the registry from being a provider and to prohibit a provider from employing, contracting with, or accepting volunteer services from a person whose name appears on the registry.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Carl Rollins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-03-10 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-09 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB520.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB520/bill.doc |