KY HB513 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.500, 210.485, 210.506, 210.509, 214.185, 222.003, 222.271, 222.311, 222.421, 222.430, 222.431, 222.432, 222.433; 222.434, 222.435, 222.441, 222.460, 304.17A-660, 311B.160, 600.020, 610.127, and 620.023, to change "alcohol and other drug abuse" to "substance use disorder"; amend KRS 202A.0819 and 210.365 to delete the Kentucky Commission on Services and Supports for Individuals with Mental Illness, Alcohol and Other Drug Abuse Disorders, and Dual Diagnoses; make technical corrections; add the Department for Behavioral Health, Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities; amend KRS 210.400 to correct reference; amend KRS 222.005 to delete the terms "alcohol and other drug abuse" and "juvenile"; add the term "substance use disorder"; amend KRS 222.211 to change "tobacco addiction" to "nicotine dependence"; change "alcohol and other drug abuse" to "substance use disorder"; amend KRS 222.221 to change "alcohol and other drug abuse" to "substance use disorder"; delete requirement to publish list of treatment facilities and services; amend KRS 222.231 and 222.465 to change "alcohol and other drug abuse" to "substance use disorder"; update references; change narcotic treatment program requirements; repeal KRS 222.001, 210.500, 210.502, 210.504, 210.580.
Title
AN ACT relating to substance use disorder treatment and recovery services and programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1058 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 238 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 237 (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 238 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 237 (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 128) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | passed 97-0 |
2019-03-06 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2019-03-06 | House | 3rd reading |
2019-03-05 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Drugs and Medicines
Licensing
Mental Health
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Drugs and Medicines
Licensing
Mental Health
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Substance Abuse