KY HB513 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 138.210 to set the minimum average wholesale price of gasoline for computation of motor fuels tax at $2.07 per gallon, amend KRS 138.220 to remove the exemption of 2.1 cents per gallon of motor fuels tax from revenue sharing; amend KRS 177.320 to increase the percentage of motor fuel tax allotted to the County Road Aid Fund from 18.3% to 19.5%; amend KRS 177.365 to increase the percentage of motor fuel tax allotted to the Municipal Road Aid Fund from 7.7% to 8.3%; Declare EMERGENCY on the new AWP floor in Section 1; make remaining sections EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2016.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor fuels taxes and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | discharge petition filed |
2015-03-03 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed |
2015-02-26 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-25 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |