KY HB496 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 230 to prohibit a Thoroughbred registrar from restricting the number of mares bred to a stallion or refusing to register a foal based on the number of mares bred to the foal's stallion; direct the Kentucky Horse Racing Commission to select and use a Thoroughbred registrar; require the registrar to submit to Kentucky jurisdiction and comply with KRS Chapter 230; instruct the racing commission to promulgate administrative regulations relating to Thoroughbred registrars; amend KRS 230.210 to remove the example of a Thoroughbred registrar; amend KRS 230.400 to allow the Kentucky Thoroughbred development fund registrar to stamp a Thoroughbred's certificate with the registrar's seal.
Title
AN ACT relating to Thoroughbred registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-10 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st reading |
2022-02-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Horses and Horse Racing
Racing
State Agencies
Boards and Commissions
Horses and Horse Racing
Racing
State Agencies