KY HB465 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to establish a special military unit license plate for certain units; establish eligibility and necessary documentation; amend KRS 186.162 to set forth fees for a special military unit license plate; amend KRS 186.166 to require the Transportation Cabinet to perpetually produce the special military unit license plate.
Title
AN ACT relating to special military unit license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2240 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-02-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | introduced in House |