KY HB453 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 527.020 relating to carrying concealed deadly weapons to permit carrying a loaded or unloaded firearm or other deadly weapon in any container, compartment, or storage space originally installed by the motor vehicle manufacturer.
Title
AN ACT relating to concealed deadly weapons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-16 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-16 | 3rd reading, passed 92-4 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (2) and (4) | |
2010-03-10 | floor amendments (2) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) filed | |
2010-03-09 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-03 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-02 | posting waived | |
2010-02-22 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-02-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB453.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB453/bill.doc |