KY HB446 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.110 to require local school boards to adopt a transportation services policy; amend KRS 158.148, relating to school district discipline guidelines, to require the Kentucky Department of Education to create a model transportation services policy; detail required provision of local board transportation services policies; create process for operators of transportation to report, be heard during proceedings, and receive a response regarding misconduct by students aboard transportation and also by parents or guardians; permit revocation of transportation privileges based on failure to acknowledge transportation services policy; amend KRS 158.445 to require inclusion of the transportation services policy in district safety plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public school transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2998 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 193 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-22Housesigned by Governor
2024-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-13Housereceived in House
2024-03-13Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0-1
2024-03-11Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2024
2024-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2024-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2024-03-06Senateto Education (S)
2024-03-04Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2024-03-01House3rd reading, passed 93-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
2024-02-23Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2024
2024-02-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2024-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-02-08Houseto Education (H)
2024-02-01Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-02-01Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback