KY HB427 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 183)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 183)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 314.011 to eliminate reference to the Controlled Substance Formulary Development Committee and to change the term "noncontrolled" to "nonscheduled;" amend KRS 314.031 to reference the disciplinary statute and to eliminate the list of reportable offenses; amend KRS 314.035 to establish a mandatory reporting requirement for anyone who has knowledge of a potential violation by a dialysis technician; amend KRS 314.042 to update language concerning the definition of an advanced practice registered nurse (APRN), require an applicant for an APRN license to take a jurisprudence examination; simplify reporting of the rescission of a CAPA-NS or CS; amend KRS 314.085 to clarify that evaluations must be submitted within 30 days; amend KRS 314.089 to clarify when an immediate suspension of a license is warranted; amend KRS 314.091 to add use or possession of a Schedule I controlled substance and use or impairment by use of alcohol or drugs to the list of violations; amend 314.101 to clarify when a nurse that is temporarily in the state does not need a license; amend KRS 314.181 to clarify when a registered nurse may pronounce the death of a patient; amend KRS 314.111 to allow the Board of Nursing to fine a program of nursing that is not in compliance with regulations; amend KRS 311A.185 to conform; repeal KRS 314.046 and 314.105.
Title
AN ACT relating to nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 508 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 675 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 324 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 675 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 324 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 183) |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | passed 86-0 |
2018-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | received in House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-23 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | introduced in House |