KY HB421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - returned to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - returned to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.540 to add one representative of a recognized consumer advocacy group representing persons reentering society following incarceration to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance; amend KRS 205.590 to create a Technical Advisory Committee on Persons Returning to Society from Incarceration to act in an advisory capacity to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 186 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-04-01 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-03 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-14 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Courts
Medicaid
Mental Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Courts
Medicaid
Mental Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies