KY HB406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 designating the Honor and Remember flag as the state's emblem of the service and sacrifice of the brave men and women of the United States Armed Forces who have given their lives in the line of duty; specify locations, dates, and circumstances under which the flag may be displayed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Honor and Remember Flag.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 209 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-13Senate1st reading
2019-03-13Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-07Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-04House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-15Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback