KY HB404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 47)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 47)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.211 to increase the amount of an extraordinary medical expense from $100 to $250; amend KRS 403.212 to update the child support guidelines table and a self-support reserve; establish guidelines for imputation of income; create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to establish adjustments to a child support obligation based upon parenting time; amend KRS 406.031 to decrease the time liability for child support shall attach in a paternity action from 4 years to 2 years; amend KRS 620.090 to establish an action for child support when a court issues a temporary order for child custody; amend KRS 403.160 and 620.230 to conform; Section 3 EFFECTIVE March 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Angie Hatton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 312 (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1701 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 78 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1701 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 78 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 47) |
2021-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | passed 87-5 |
2021-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |