KY HB398 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.300 to create the Office of Kentucky Veterans' Centers, Office of Veteran Legal Services, and Office of Kentucky Veterans' Services within the Office of the Commissioner within the Department of Veterans' Affairs; amend KRS 40.325 to conform; and confirm Executive Order 2020-823.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1756 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-22 | House | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | introduced in House |