KY HB393 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 74.020 to allow the Public Service Commission to grant reasonable extensions of time not to exceed six months for water district commissioners to complete their training requirements; amend KRS 74.363 to conform; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to water district commissioners and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1754 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 151 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 43)
2021-03-16Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-16Housereceived in House
2021-03-16Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2021-03-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2021-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
2021-03-11Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2021-03-05Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-03-05Senate1st reading
2021-03-05Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-03-03Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-03-02Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-01House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2021-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-02-26House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-25Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-10Houseposted in committee
2021-02-10Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2021-02-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-04Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback