KY HB388 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 342.0011 to define "deductible program adjustment" and specify items to be considered on policies with provision for deductibles; amend KRS 342.122 to require all assessments to be remitted electronically beginning on January 1, 2020; amend KRS 342.1221 to clarify that interest is paid for late payment of expenses; amend KRS 342.1231 to change the term "taxpayer" to "assessment payer"; set a 7-year limitation from the date of the quarterly premium report or amended quarterly premium report for assessments; require records to be preserved for audits, explain when payment is final, and when a refund should be returned; amend KRS 342.1242 to require KEMI to reimburse for expenses to collect the coal assessment; amend KRS 342.1243 to clarify when assessments for the coal workers' pneumoconiosis fund cease and when the fund is abolished.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Workers' Compensation Funding Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 393 (Y: 57 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 392 (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 583 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 392 (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 583 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 54) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | passed 57-32 |
2018-03-22 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-03-21 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-21 | House | received in House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-5 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2018-03-14 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-18 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-21 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2018-02-16 | House | introduced in House |