KY HB386 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 318.990 to enhance penalties for violation of plumbing laws, plumbing administrative regulations, or the state plumbing code; penalize a licensee for plumbing violations with a fine of $100 to $500, imprisonment for up to 90 days, or both; punish a person who is not licensed under KRS Chapter 318 for plumbing violations with a fine of $500 to $2,500, imprisonment for up to 180 days, or both; require the Department of Housing, Buildings and Construction to promulgate administrative regulations that establish a schedule of fines and violations; prohibit the promulgation of any of these administrative regulations until they have received the review, comments, and recommendations of the State Plumbing Code Committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to plumbing violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23. 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-09 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2011-02-08 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB386.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB386/bill.doc |