KY HB375 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 95A to direct the Commission of Fire Protection Personnel Standards and Education to develop procedures for accepting military training and service towards firefighter certification; create a new section of KRS Chapter 311A to direct the Board of Emergency Medical Services to allow direct reciprocity for initial Kentucky certification as an emergency medical technician for members of the United States military; urge all board and commissions to review military training and when possible accept military training and service towards licensure and certification in various occupational specialties.
Title
AN ACT relating to military training credit towards occupational licenses and certifications.
Sponsors
Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2013-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-14 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB375.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB375/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB375/vote_history.pdf |