KY HB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 17.165 to define "criminal offense against a victim who is a minor"; require that all employers of applicants for initial employment in positions involving supervisory or disciplinary power over minors request conviction information from the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet or the Administrative Office of the Courts; prohibit hiring of such applicants if they were convicted of a violent crime, sex crime, or criminal offense against a minor victim, or have been found by a court to have abused or neglected a child; amend KRS 199.011 to add the definition for "rap back system"; amend KRS 199.462 to allow the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to register members of certified adoptive or foster homes into the rap back system; create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to define "child care staff member"; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to require child care staff members to submit to background checks; permit the cabinet to charge a fee for the check and require that the fee charged to the cabinet is no greater than the actual cost of the check; require the promulgation of administrative regulations; amend KRS 199.896 to require directors and employees of child-care centers with supervisory or disciplinary power over minors or in direct contact with minors to submit to background checks; amend KRS 199.8982 to require family child-care providers to submit to background checks; amend KRS 17.990 to conform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to federally mandated background checks and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill passed 93-0 |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | reassigned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | introduced in House |