KY HB374 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.321 to permit an instructor to vote and to be selected as a representative to a board of regents in one of the comprehensive universities.
Title
AN ACT relating to election of faculty representative to boards of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 41) | |
2010-03-24 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-24 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-24 | received in House | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-18 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | to Education (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with committee amendment (1) | |
2010-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) | |
2010-02-19 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-08 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB374.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB374/bill.doc |