KY HB369 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 140)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 140)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 360.010 to specify when parties are bound to interest rate in contract and the interest rate parties are entitled to receive after default; create a new section of KRS Chapter 371 to specify that an obligation to pay or satisfy a debt is not extinguished by any action taken by a creditor for the purposes of the creditor's own financial, tax, or accounting records or affairs.
Title
AN ACT relating to contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 650 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 187 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 187 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 140) |
2018-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-27 | House | received in House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-16 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | introduced in House |