KY HB365 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 148.8531 to extend the sunset date to receive tax incentives offered under the Kentucky Tourism Development Act an additional 4 years.
Title
AN ACT extending sales tax incentives authorized by the Kentucky Tourism Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-15 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB365.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB365/bill.pdf |