KY HB365 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-005 to redefine "employer-organized association" for the purpose of health benefit plans.
Title
AN ACT relating to health benefit plan definitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | received in House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2013-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-19 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-14 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | introduced in House |