KY HB361 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 441.520, relating to the transfer of prisoners, to require an agreement between an originating and receiving jail before ordering the transfer of a prisoner; specify that if a transfer is ordered before receiving an agreement, the receiving jail shall not be required to house the prisoner nor shall the receiving jail's jailer be subject to contempt; outline what a receiving jail may charge for housing a transferred prisoner; require a sheriff to transport the transferred prisoner; require a Circuit Judge to review his or her transfer order every 60 days; amend KRS 441.530 to conform; amend KRS 532.100, relating to the placement of state prisoners, to provide for the transfer of state prisoners from jails at or over 150% capacity; allow a jail to place county prisoners in an area usually reserved for state prisoners if that area has vacant beds; amend KRS 197.020, 439.3407, 441.005, 441.045, 441.146, and 533.025 to conform: EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prisoners and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1436 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 182 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 109)
2020-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2020-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-14Housereceived in House
2020-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 31-1
2020-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-03-17Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-03-10Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-05House3rd reading, passed 93-1 with Committee Substitute (1), and floor amendments (3) and (4)
2020-03-04Housefloor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (5) filed to bill
2020-03-02Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-20Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2020
2020-02-20House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-19Housefloor amendment (1) filed to bill, floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-19Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-03Houseposted in committee
2020-02-03Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-01-31Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback