KY HB357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.9-230 to create a self-storage space insurance limited line of authority for an agent's license; create a new section of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to define terms relating to self-service storage space insurance; create a new section of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to authorize an operator of a self-service storage facility to offer and disseminate insurance for personal property located within a leased space of the facility on behalf of and under the control of a limited lines self-service storage space insurance producer, subject to specified requirements; create a new section of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to require provision of specified consumer protection disclosures to the occupant leasing the space.
Title
AN ACT relating to self-service storage space insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59) |
2014-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-27 | House | received in House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 26, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-10 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | introduced in House |