KY HB353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 67C.105 to provide that, in the case of a vacancy in the office of mayor of a consolidated local government, the presiding officer of the legislative council shall serve as temporary mayor until a new mayor is elected by the legislative council, or if the legislative council does not elect a new mayor within 30 days, until the Governor appoints a new mayor and that appointee assumes the office.
Title
AN ACT relating to consolidated local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-26 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-20 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-20 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-10 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | introduced in House |