KY HB352 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The State/Executive Branch Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to General Government: 2019-2020: $21,535,000, 2020-2021: $1,793,871,500, 2021-2022: $1,813,688,900; appropriate to the Economic Development Cabinet: 2020-2021: $33,195,900, 2021-2022: $36,055,300; appropriate to the Department of Education: 2020-2021: $5,183,508,800, 2021-2022: $5,228,565,200; appropriate to the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet: 2020-2021: $615,595,100, 2021-2022: $617,246,200; appropriate to the Energy and Environment Cabinet: 2019-2020: $700,000, 2020-2021: $272,541,300, 2021-2022: $253,649,300; appropriate to the Finance and Administration Cabinet: 2019-2020: $2,800,000, 2020-2021: $1,000,424,300, 2021-2022: $972,192,200; appropriate to the Health and Family Services Cabinet: 2020-2021: $15,007,584,100, 2021-2022: $15,285,043,300; appropriate to the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet: 2019-2020: $17,216,900, 2020-2021: $1,345,687,300, 2021-2022: $1,369,130,400; appropriate to the Labor Cabinet: 2020-2021: $202,693,700, 2021-2022: $204,407,600; appropriate to the Personnel Cabinet: 2020-2021: $64,171,200, 2021-2022: $64,610,500; appropriate to Postsecondary Education: 2019-2020: $497,400, 2020-2021: $8,536,480,700, 2021-2022: $8,930,169,100; appropriate to the Public Protection Cabinet: 2020-2021: $129,067,100, 2021-2022: $129,301,700; appropriate to the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet: 2019-2020: $2,700,000, 2020-2021: $275,773,400, 2021-2022: $281,291,000; appropriate to the Budget Reserve Trust Fund: 2020-2021: $10,000,000, 2021-2022: $0; not included in the appropriation amounts are capital project amounts as follows: 2019-2020: $7,500,000, 2020-2021: $6,537,358,500, 2021-2022: $249,695,600; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, General Provisions; detail Part IV, State Salary/Compensation, Benefit, and Employment Policy; detail Part V, Funds Transfer; detail Part VI, General Fund Budget Reduction Plan; detail Part VII, General Fund Surplus Expenditure Plan; detail Part VIII, Road Fund Budget Reduction Plan; detail Part IX, Road Fund Surplus Expenditure Plan; detail Part X, Phase I Tobacco Settlement; and detail Part XI, Executive Branch Budget Summary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to appropriations measures providing funding and establishing conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, cabinets, departments, boards, commissions, institutions, subdivisions, agencies, and other state-supported activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1451 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 371 (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 328 (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/fccr FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1423 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1405 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 190 (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 189 (Y: 36 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 188 (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 92)
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Senatereceived in House
2020-04-15Housebill passed 27-7
2020-04-15Houseveto overridden in Senate
2020-04-15Houseposted for consideration of Governor's veto
2020-04-15Houseto Rules (S)
2020-04-15Housereceived in Senate
2020-04-15Senatebill passed 57-33
2020-04-15Senateveto overridden in House
2020-04-15Senateposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto for Wednesday, April 15, 2020
2020-04-15Senatetaken from Rules
2020-04-14Senateto Rules (H)
2020-04-14Senateveto message received in House
2020-04-13Houseline items vetoed
2020-04-01Housedelivered to Governor
2020-04-01Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-01Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-01Housepassed 80-10
2020-04-01HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2020-04-01Houseposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report
2020-04-01Houseto Rules (H)
2020-04-01Housereceived in House
2020-04-01Senatepassed 34-0
2020-04-01SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2020-04-01Senateposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report on April 1, 2020
2020-04-01SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2020-04-01SenateFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2020-04-01SenateConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2020-04-01SenateConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2020-03-26SenateConference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2020-03-26SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-26Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Housetaken from Rules
2020-03-19Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-19Senate3rd reading, passed 24-7 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-17Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-11Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-09Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-06House3rd reading, passed 86-10 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-06Housefloor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-05Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-05Housetaken from Rules (H)
2020-03-05Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-03Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-03House1st reading
2020-03-03Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-02-05Houseposted in committee
2020-01-29Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-28Houseintroduced in House

Subjects

Agriculture
Appropriations
Area Development Districts
Attorney General
Attorney, Commonwealth's
Attorney, County
Auditor of Public Accounts
Boards and Commissions
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Economic Development
Education, Finance
Energy
Environment and Conservation
Fish and Wildlife
Governor
Homeland Security
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Housing, Building, and Construction
Jails and Jailers
Labor and Industry
Lieutenant Governor
Local Government
Lottery
Medicaid
Mental Health
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Police, State
Probation and Parole
Prosecutors
Public Advocate
Public Buildings and Grounds
Public Officers and Employees
Public Records and Reports
Public Salaries
Public Utilities
Retirement and Pensions
Secretary of State
State Agencies
State Employees
Tobacco
Tourism
Treasurer
Universities and Colleges
Workers' Compensation

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback