KY HB34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.010 to increase the applicable threshold of employees of retail stores and service industries from $95,000 to $500,000 average annual gross volume of sales for the employer; amend KRS 337.275 to raise the state minimum wage to $8.20 per hour on July 1, 2021, $9.15 per hour on July 1, 2022, $10.10 per hour on July 1, 2023, $11 per hour on July 1, 2024, $12.05 per hour on July 1, 2025, $13.10 per hour on July 1, 2026, $13.95 per hour on July 1, 2027, and $15 per hour on July 1, 2028; raise the state minimum wage for tipped employees to $2.13 per hour on the effective date of the Act, $3.05 per hour on July 1, 2022, $3.95 per hour on July 1, 2023, and $4.90 per hour on July 1, 2024; include anti-preemption language permitting local governments to establish minimum wage ordinances in excess of the state minimum wage.
Title
AN ACT relating to wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D] | Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] |
Rep. Patti Minter [D] | Rep. Josie Raymond [D] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] | Rep. Lisa Willner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-09-04 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Labor and Industry
Local Government
Local Mandate
Personnel and Employment
Wages and Hours
Counties
Labor and Industry
Local Government
Local Mandate
Personnel and Employment
Wages and Hours