KY HB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 18A.150 to remove veteran's preference points and replace with interview preference for current or former members of the Armed Forces, Reserves, or National Guard or their spouse, unmarried widow or widower, or parent, if he or she meets the minimum qualifications for the job classification.
Title
AN ACT relating to employment opportunities for service members and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 998 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 119 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 998 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 119 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 109) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 93-0 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-14 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | introduced in House |