KY HB330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 119.205 to prohibit payment to any person by a candidate or committee, or any person acting on behalf of a candidate or committee, for the purpose of transporting a voter to the polls; Class B misdemeanor; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | introduced in House |