KY HB316 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 23A and 24A to establish an additional administrative fee of $30 for perpetrators of domestic violence and abuse, sex crimes, and stalking; provide that $1.50 be placed in the general fund and the remainder be allocated to the address protection program fund; amend KRS 14.260 to establish the address protection program fund to establish, operate, and maintain the confidential address protection program.
Title
AN ACT relating to address protection and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | introduced in House |