KY HB31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 344.010 to provide definitions of "protective hairstyle" and "race" that include traits historically associated with race; amend KRS 158.148 to provide that school disciplinary codes shall prohibit discrimination on the basis of race; establish the short title of "C.R.O.W.N. Act".
Title
AN ACT relating to discriminatory practices against a person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-06-30 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Civil Procedure
Civil Rights
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Race Relations
Short Titles and Popular Names
Civil Rights
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Race Relations
Short Titles and Popular Names
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hb31.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hb31/orig_bill.pdf |