KY HB296 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 89)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 11.200 to reduce the membership of the Commission on Small Business Advocacy to 13 members to be appointed by the Governor, with two members representing each congressional district and one at-large member; attach the commission to the Department for Business Development; amend KRS 12.020 to place the Office of Legal Services within the Office of the Secretary; abolish the Department for New Business Development, the Department for Existing Business Development, the Department of Commercialization and Innovation, and the Department of Financial Incentives and transfer their functions and positions to the Department for Business Development, established under the Office of the Secretary; attach the Bluegrass State Skills Corporation to the Department for Business Development; attach the Kentucky Economic Finance Authority to the Office of Financial services; repeal KRS 154.12-214, 154.12-215, 154.12-216, 154.12-217, 154.12-218, 154.12-220, 154.12-222, 154.12-225, 154.12-2333; confirm Resolution 13-03 of the Kentucky Economic Development Partnership. dated June 18, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 89)
2014-03-31Housedelivered to Governor
2014-03-31Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-03-31Housepassed 98-0
2014-03-31HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2014-03-31Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Monday, March 31, 2014
2014-03-28Houseto Rules (H)
2014-03-28Housereceived in House
2014-03-27Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014
2014-03-26Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2014-03-24Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-24Senate2nd reading
2014-03-24Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-21Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-21Senate1st reading
2014-03-21Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2014-02-26Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2014-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2014-02-21House3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2014
2014-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-02-10Houseposted in committee
2014-02-03Houseto Economic Development (H)
2014-01-30Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback