KY HB280 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 121.180 to allow a candidate, whose district number is altered pursuant to an enacted plan of redistricting or reapportionment the ability to use funds contained in his or her campaign account for an election to the subsequent district where the candidate is then properly filed; make amendments retroactive to November 3, 2021; RETROACTIVE; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
2022-01-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-01-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2022-01-19Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2022-01-12Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-12Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback