KY HB276 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 131 to create the office of taxpayer ombudsman; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 42.0651 to substitute the Division of State Risk and Insurance Services for some duties performed by the Office of Policy and Audit and require the division to provide insurance for state-owned and operated facilities and vehicles; amend KRS 42.0174 to delete the reference to KRS 42.0651; amend KRS 42.560 to require fifty percent of the energy assistance trust fund interest to be distributed to the Finance and Administration Cabinet for weatherization services to low-income households, and fifty percent to be distributed to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services for energy assistance services for low-income households; amend KRS 42.566 to require appropriated expenditures from the energy assistance trust fund to be distributed forty percent to the Finance and Administration Cabinet for weatherization services to low-income households, and sixty percent to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services for energy crisis or prevention services for low-income households; amend KRS 42.724 to move the Division of Geographic Information Systems from the Office of Enterprise Technology to the Office of Application Development, to rename the Division of Software Engineering as the Division of Financial Information Technology, and to rename the Division of Consulting and Project Management as the Division of Agency Information Technology; amend KRS 42.740 to rename the Kentucky Geospatial Board as the Geographic Information Advisory Council; amend KRS 131.020 to place the taxpayer ombudsman in the office of the commissioner of revenue; amend KRS 42.0201, 42.650, 42.726, 42.742, 42.744, and 116.200 to conform; confirm Executive Order 2011-354.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-30 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 30, 2012 | |
2012-03-29 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-28 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-21 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-16 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2012-02-14 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2012 | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-20 | to State Government (H) | |
2012-01-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB276.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB276/bill.doc |