KY HB272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.380 to clarify that, in the event a second property valuation administrator exam within a county is necessary, notice shall be made by issuing a press release in that county and by posting an announcement on the Web site of the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 133.020 to allow for an authorized person other than the county judge/executive to swear in a new member of the local board of assessment appeals; amend KRS 133.120 to clarify that real estate appraisers may represent a property owner in assessment appeals; amend KRS 136.180 to clarify that common carrier water transportation companies are taxed as public service corporations under KRS 136.1801 to 136.1805; amend KRS 136.1877 to make conforming changes; amend KRS 136.310 to clarify that the total value of bank deposits maintained in Kentucky shall be determined by the same method used for filing the summary of deposits report with the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for purposes of the foreign savings and loan tax; amend KRS 136.555 to correct the statutory reference related to the local government franchise tax on bank deposits; amend KRS 138.330 to clarify that a financial instrument is an acceptable form of surety for motor fuels taxes; amend KRS 138.460 to conform to finalized litigation related to the return of a motor vehicle to a dealer within 60 days; amend KRS 138.4603 to remove an incorrect formula for determining the retail price of a new vehicle; make conforming changes.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-02-05 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-30 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | introduced in House |