KY HB251 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 310.050 to require the Board of Licensure and Certification for Dietitians and Nutritionists to set its fees through administrative regulations.
Title
AN ACT relating to fees for dietitians and nutritionists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2210 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 60 (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 60 (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79) |
2022-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-13 |
2022-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Fees
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Boards and Commissions
Fees
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions