KY HB244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.650 to establish the Division of Enterprise Portfolios within the newly established Office of IT Architecture and Governance; amend KRS 42.724 to establish the Offices of Project Management, IT Services and Delivery, IT Architecture and Governance, the Chief Information Security Officer, KY Business One Stop; abolish the Offices of Enterprise Technology, Infrastructure Services, Application Development, Chief Information Officer, and Information Technology Service Management; amend KRS 42.726 to declare the Commonwealth Office of Technology the lead organizational entity within the executive branch regarding information technology services and the single information technology authority for the Commonwealth; amend KRS 42.730 to require the executive director of the Commonwealth Office of Technology to serve as the chief information officer for all agencies within the executive branch; include in the duties of the executive director, the approval of technology acquisitions prior to any procurement; amend KRS 42.738 to change the titles of chief of information officers of various agencies to information technology leads; amend KRS 42.742, 42.744, and 116.200 to conform; amend KRS 131.020 to establish a Division of Application Development and Support within the Office of Processing and Enforcement in the Department of Revenue; confirm Executive Order 2017-0889.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 610 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 197 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 197 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 78) |
2018-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-26 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | introduced in House |