KY HB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 019)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 019)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67.710 to include a timetable for county judge/executive appointments to fill a vacancy; require the judge/executive to submit a nomination to the fiscal court within 60 days of the vacancy; provide that the fiscal court shall approve or disapprove the nomination within 45 days, and if the judge/executive fails to nominate within the prescribed period, the fiscal court shall fill the vacancy; provide that if the fiscal court fails to approve or disapprove the nomination within the prescribed period, the nominee is deemed approved, and if the fiscal court disapproves a nomination, the period for the judge/executive to nominate shall be reset to a new 45-day period, and if county judge/executive fails to nominate another person within 45 days, a majority of the fiscal court shall fill the vacancy.
Title
AN ACT relating to county appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 899 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 109 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 109 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 019) |
2019-03-05 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-01 | House | received in House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with committee amendment (1) |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | introduced in House |