KY HB229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.7631, relating to amounts distributed to public safety answering points (PSAPs) for the purposes of answering, routing, and properly disposing of CMRS 911 calls, to remove the qualifier "CMRS."
Title
AN ACT relating to 911 services and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 279 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1376 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 50 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1376 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 50 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 40) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | passed 83-0 |
2020-03-19 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2020-01-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-13 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Prevention
Health and Medical Services
Homeland Security
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Protection
Public Safety
Telecommunications
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Prevention
Health and Medical Services
Homeland Security
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Protection
Public Safety
Telecommunications