KY HB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.015 to allow a peace officer to arrest a person for a misdemeanor violation of KRS 512.030, 512.040, and 514.030 when committed in the officer's presence; allow a peace officer to issue a citation when the officer has probable cause to believe that a misdemeanor was committed outside of his or her presence.
Title
AN ACT relating to arrests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | recommitted to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-19 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-02-20 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2018-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 20, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | introduced in House |