KY HB202 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 314.011 to expand the definition of "licensed pratical nursing practice" and to expand the definition of "advanced practice registered nursing;" amend KRS 314.021 to grant the Kentucky Board of Nursing additional regulatory authority; amend KRS 314.042 to clarify when the board may authorize a person to practice as an advanced practice registered nurse temporarily; amend the reviewing procedure for a Collaborative Agreement for the Advanced Practice Registered Nurse’s Prescriptive Authority for Nonscheduled Legend Drugs (CAPA-NS); amend when an advanced practice registered nurse is exempt from the Collaborative Agreement for the Advanced Practice Registered Nurse’s Prescriptive Authority for Nonscheduled Legend Drugs requirement; and clarify the procedures for when an advanced practice registered nurse may obtain a controlled substance certificate; amend KRS 314.107 to allow for additional forms of correspondence; amend KRS 314.131 to grant the Kentucky Board of Nursing additional regulatory authority; repeal KRS 314. 196, relating to the Collaborative Prescribing Agreement Joint Advisory Committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1749 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 166 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 166 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-10 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |